skip to content

Lougheed, Nicholas Stewart

CPSO#: 88936

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Sep 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University College of Dublin, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Imaging Services
Royal Victorial Regional Health Ctr
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone: 705-728-9090 Ext. 43466
Fax: 705-739-5629 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Nicholas Lougheed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 16 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Lougheed ( CPSO# 88936 )

Business Address:
Royal Victoria Hospital Regional Health Centre
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 728-9090

Business Address:
Little Lake Health Centre
LL01
11 Lakeside Terrace
Barrie ON  L4M 0H9
Phone Number: (705) 722-8036

Business Address:
Georgian Bay Genera; Hospital
1112 St. Andrew Drive
Midland ON  L4R 4P4
Phone Number: (705) 526-1300

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NICHOLAS STEWART LOUGHEED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOUGHEED is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 23 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2014 to 31 Mar 2015
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2013