skip to content

Loubani, Tarek Mahmoud

CPSO#: 89554

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French, Spanish

Education:Western University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
Department of Emergency Medicine
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Electoral District: 02

Additional Practice Location(s)

London Intercommunity Health Centre
659 Dundas Street
London ON  N5W 2Z1
Canada
Phone: (519) 660-0874
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Tarek Loubani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 02 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Loubani ( CPSO# 89554 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
Department of Emergency Medicine
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:19 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. TAREK MAHMOUD LOUBANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOUBANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2008 to 27 Jul 2008
EL - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Jul 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009