skip to content

Lotfy, Khaled Hany Abdelsalam

CPSO#: 91225

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Mar 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Ain Shams University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC University Hospital
Department of Nephrology
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Fax: 519-663-3449 Electoral District: 02

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective:27 Sep 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KHALED HANY ABDELSALAM LOTFY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOTFY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2009 to 24 Aug 2009
PEAP - CF - Nephrology

Western University, 25 Aug 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Nephrology

Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Nephrology

Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Nephrology

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Apr 2013
CF - Nephrology

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Sep 2013
AVP - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2014 to 08 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 09 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2015 to 08 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 09 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

Western University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Western University, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Mar 2018