skip to content

Loreto, Michael Peter

CPSO#: 86800

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 31 Jul 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North Bay Regional Health Centre
Radiology Department
50 College Drive
North Bay ON  P1B0A4
Phone: (705) 474-8600 Ext. 2845 Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Michael P. Loreto Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 26 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Loreto ( CPSO# 86800 )

Business Address:
50 College Drive
North Bay ON  P1B 5A4
Phone Number: (705) 474-8600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
West Nipissing General Hospital Sturgeon Falls

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MICHAEL PETER LORETO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LORETO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2012