skip to content

Lorenzen, David Irving

CPSO#: 18800

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 08 Jul 1963

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Nov 1962
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1963
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013

Concerns

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: November 30, 2013
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Undertaking by Dr. David Irving Lorenzen to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (the “College”). (NOTE: This is a summary of the undertaking. For the complete terms, contact the College’s Membership Services Department):

I, Dr. David Irving Lorenzen:

(1) Certificate of registration number 18800, was a member of the College between July 8, 1963 and June 1, 2013. I resigned from membership on June 1, 2013.

(2) Acknowledge that, as of the date of this Undertaking, I am the subject of an investigation by the College regarding my practice of hyperbaric medicine (the "Investigation").

(3) Acknowledge that there has been no referral to the Discipline Committee of the College in respect of the Investigation and that the concerns arising in the Investigation were not proven before the Discipline Committee.

(4) Hereby undertake not to apply or re apply for registration as a physician or for a certificate of registration to practise medicine in Ontario.

(5) Hereby undertake not to practise hyperbaric medicine in Ontario.

(6) Agree that if that the College becomes aware that I have applied for registration as a physician or that I have practised hyperbaric medicine in Ontario, the College shall have the right to re commence the Investigation which was terminated as a result of this Undertaking, and/or proceed with a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee.

(9) Undertake to the College that upon signing this Undertaking, I shall forward a request to the General Manager of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan ("OHIP") that my billing number be deactivated for services rendered after the Effective Date.

(12) Give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person or institution who may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the terms of this Undertaking.

(13) Consent to the terms of this Undertaking being entered on the register as information that is available to the public.