skip to content

Lopez, Christopher John

CPSO#: 85804

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 106
2425 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON  N8W 1E6
Phone: (519) 254-5763
Fax: (519) 997-3700 Electoral District: 01

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 208
13278 Tecumseh Road East
Tecumseh ON  N8N 3T6
Canada
Phone: (519) 254-5763
Fax: (519) 997-3700
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Christopher J. Lopez Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 17 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Lopez ( CPSO# 85804 )

Business Address:
Suite 208
13278 Tecumseh Road East
Tecumseh ON  N8N 3T6
Phone Number: (519) 254-5763

Business Address:
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 973-4411

Business Address:
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 254-5577

Business Address:
194 Talbot Street West
Leamington ON  N8H 1N9
Phone Number: (519) 322-2501

Business Address:
2425 Tecumseh Road East
Suite 106
Windsor ON  N8W 1E6
Phone Number: (519) 254-5763

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Erie Shores HealthCare Leamington
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER JOHN LOPEZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOPEZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 19 Dec 2006 to 15 Jan 2007
EL - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 10 Aug 2009 to 06 Sep 2009
EL - Orthopedic Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 07 Sep 2009 to 04 Oct 2009
EL - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jan 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Oct 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011