skip to content

Lopez Alonso, Jose Oscar

CPSO#: 89730

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 08 Aug 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Mar 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Inst.Sup.Ciencias de Med.de Stgo.de Cuba, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 301
1 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone: (705) 726-2994
Fax: (705) 726-1069 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

201 Georgian Dr
RVH
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Canada
Phone: (705) 728-9090
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Jose O. Lopez Alonso Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 29 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lopez Alonso ( CPSO# 89730 )

Business Address:
301 - 1 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone Number: (705) 725-0885

Business Address:
Royal Victoria Hospital of Barrie
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 241-6226

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Sep 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JOSE OSCAR LOPEZ ALONSO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOPEZ ALONSO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 08 Aug 2008 to 30 Oct 2008
AVP - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 31 Oct 2008 to 07 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 08 Aug 2009 to 07 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 08 Aug 2010 to 07 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 2011