skip to content

Longtin, Jean

CPSO#: 90407

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 04 May 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Microbiology Effective:28 Jul 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 31 Aug 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Medical Microbiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 May 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2010