skip to content

Long, Barry Herbert

CPSO#: 28078

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 11 Mar 1976
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 11 Mar 1976

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
235 Danforth Avenue
Suite 404
Toronto ON  M4K 1N2
Phone: (416) 465-2556
Fax: (416) 465-3033 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Barry H. Long Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 19 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Long ( CPSO# 28078 )

Business Address:
Suite 404
235 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4K 1N2
Phone Number: (416) 465-2556

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:15 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist
Dermatology Effective:24 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BARRY HERBERT LONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LONG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 1976