First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 Apr 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 04 May 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 20 Feb 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 09 Mar 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 28 Jul 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 Aug 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 27 Jul 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 Aug 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 26 Jul 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Aug 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 30 Jul 2017 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 05 Aug 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 29 Jul 2018 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 04 Aug 2018 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 28 Jul 2019 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 Aug 2019 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Restricted Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2021 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 06 Aug 2021 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Restricted Certificate |
Effective: 31 Jul 2022 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 05 Aug 2022 |