skip to content

Lohmann, Tara Ellen

CPSO#: 88204

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 03 Aug 2019
EXPIRY DATE
03 Aug 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 28 Jul 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
YMCA Camp Queen Elizabeth
PO Box 249
Honey Harbour ON  P0E 1E0 Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Respirology Effective:02 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 07 Apr 2008 to 04 May 2008
EL - Respirology

Queen's University, 20 Feb 2012 to 09 Mar 2012
EL - Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Apr 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 May 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Feb 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Mar 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Aug 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Aug 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Aug 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Aug 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Aug 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Aug 2019