skip to content

Loh, Eldon

CPSO#: 89735

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 Jul 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Parkwood Institute
550 Wellington Road (Main)
London ON  N6C 0A7
Phone: (519) 685-4080
Fax: (519) 685-4081 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Eldon Loh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 21 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Loh ( CPSO# 89735 )

Business Address:
Parkwood Institue
550 Wellington Road
London ON  N6C 0A7
Phone Number: (519) 685-4080

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care,London - Parkwood Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective:30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ELDON LOH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 12 Aug 2008 to 24 Oct 2008
EL - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Oct 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2011