skip to content

Logaridis, Terry Elefterios

CPSO#: 30952

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 12 Jul 1979
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 1979

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:National and Kapodistrian Univ of Athens, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Terry E. Logaridis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 05 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Logaridis ( CPSO# 30952 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients seeking to access their medical record can contact: Records Managment Ltd, Tel: 1-800-775-0093, Fax: 647-933-2904.
Date Received: 17 Jun 2019

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Shouldice Hospital Ltd. Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:22 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. TERRY ELEFTERIOS LOGARIDIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOGARIDIS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1979