skip to content

Logan, Diane Mary

CPSO#: 32126

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 1980
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 18 Dec 1980

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Regional Cancer Program
London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
P.O. Box 5010, STN B
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8640
Fax: (519) 685-8624 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: D. Logan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 28 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Logan ( CPSO# 32126 )

Business Address:
London Regional Cancer Program
London Health Sciences Centre
790 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 4L6
Phone Number: (519) 685-8600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 13 Jun 1984 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 05 Sep 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DIANE MARY LOGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOGAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 1980