skip to content

Loftus, Philip John Anthony

CPSO#: 21340

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Jul 1991
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Nov 1990 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Oct 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 May 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Dec 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Dec 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jul 1991