skip to content

Loewy, John Allan

CPSO#: 31455

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Aug 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 13 Jun 1985

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Loewy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 18 2007
Corporation Name: John Loewy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 10 2010

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:28 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 May 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Aug 2013