skip to content

Lodhi, Gulshan

CPSO#: 28652

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Y. Mnyusiwalla Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 21 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Mnyusiwalla ( CPSO# 30510 )
Dr. G. Lodhi ( CPSO# 28652 )

Business Address:
True North Imaging
751 Victoria Sstreet South
Suite B100
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N4
Phone Number: (519) 742-2636

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1974
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2019