skip to content

Lodhi, Abid Mohyud Din

CPSO#: 99227

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 15 Aug 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 15 Aug 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 08 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Critical Care

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Oct 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Apr 2017
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Aug 2018