skip to content

Lockyer, Michelle April

CPSO#: 88740

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
South East Toronto Family Health
1871 Danforth Ave
Toronto ON  M4C 1J3
Phone: (416) 699-7775
Fax: (416) 699-7766 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Get Maple
4th floor
325 Front St W
https://www.getmaple.ca/contact/
Toronto ON  M5V 2Y1
Canada
Phone: 16476889721
Fax: (416) 699-7766
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

325 Front St W
4th floor
https://www.getmaple.ca/contact/
Toronto ON  M5V 2Y1
Canada
Phone: 16476889721
Fax: (416) 699-7766
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MICHELLE APRIL LOCKYER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOCKYER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2011 to 31 Mar 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2010