skip to content

Lockey, Andrew James

CPSO#: 98567

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 11 Jul 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Limerick, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Hospital
Stroke Prevention Clinic
100 Queensway W
Mississauga ON  L5K 2B5
Phone: (905) 848-7100 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Andrew Lockey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 29 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lockey ( CPSO# 98567 )

Business Address:
Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Hospital
Stroke Preventon Clinic
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5K 2B5
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANDREW JAMES LOCKEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOCKEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 24 Sep 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Neurology

McMaster University, 25 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2018