skip to content

Locke, Amy Louise

CPSO#: 97805

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Jul 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Commodore, Amy Louise (used until: 17 Jun 2014 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2235 Parkedale Ave
Brockville ON  K6V6B2
Phone: 613-342-4076
Fax: 613-342-6578 Electoral District: 06

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:27 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AMY LOUISE LOCKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOCKE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2014