skip to content

Lo, Tiffany

CPSO#: 98142

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:University Of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
191 McNaughton Road East, Unit 306
Vaughan ON  L6A 4E2
Phone: 905-303-8353
Fax: 905-832-1270 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

2830 Keele St, suite 402
North York ON  M3M 3E5
Canada
Phone: 416-633-7337
Fax: 416-633-8099
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Tiffany Lo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 28 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Yang ( CPSO# 98094 )
Dr. T. Lo ( CPSO# 98142 )

Business Address:
306-191 McNaughton Rd E
Maple ON  L6A 4E2

Business Address:
10 Royal Orchard Boulevard
Thornhill ON  L3T 3C3
Phone Number: (905) 771-7600

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:19 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. TIFFANY LO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2014