skip to content

Lo, Marco Che Ho

CPSO#: 93477

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 Sep 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Sep 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Albany Medical College of Union Univ, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Magenta Health
Unit 108
625 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M4M 1G7
Phone: (647) 479-8410
Fax: (647) 689-3028 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Marco Lo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 18 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Lo ( CPSO# 93477 )

Business Address:
Magenta Health
108 - 625 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M4M 1G7
Phone Number: (647) 479-8410

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARCO CHE HO LO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2012