skip to content

Lo, Louis Yik Chi

CPSO#: 18397

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 07 Nov 1969
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 07 Nov 1969

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English, Mandarin

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 4
700 Markham Road
Scarborough ON  M1H 2A7
Phone: 647-350-6717
Fax: 647-350-7679 Electoral District: 10

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Boniface Park Medical Centre 700 Markham Road Unit 4 Scarborough, ON M1H2A7
Date Received: 20 Apr 2020

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:02 Dec 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LOUIS YIK CHI LO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LO is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1962
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Dec 1964
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Nov 1969