skip to content

Lo, James Wai-Bong

CPSO#: 84868

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 10 Feb 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:Queen's University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Stevenson Memorial Hospital
P O Box 4000
200 Fletcher Crescent
Alliston ON  L9R 1W7
Phone: (705) 435-6281
Fax: (705) 435-5138 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

GSH Medical
801 Eglinton Avenue West, Suite 100
Toronto ON  M5N 1E3
Canada
Phone: 416-789-2449
Fax: 416-789-2253
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

GSH Medical Markham
7155 Woodbine Ave Suite 106
Markham ON  L3R 1A3
Canada
Phone: 416-789-2449
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

19 Hospital Drive, Box 664
Moose Factory ON  P0L 1W0
Canada
Phone: 705 658-4544
County: Territorial District of Cochrane
Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: J. Lo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 06 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lo ( CPSO# 84868 )

Business Address:
7155 Woodbine Avenue
Markham ON  L3R 1A3
Phone Number: (416) 789-2449

Business Address:
Unit 100
801 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto ON  M5N 1E3
Phone Number: (416) 789-2449

Business Address:
Box 664
19 Hospital Drive
Moose Factory ON  P0L 1W0
Phone Number: (705) 658-4544

Business Address:
Stevenson Memorial Hospital
200 Fletcher Crescent
Alliston ON  L9R 1W7
Phone Number: (705) 435-6281

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority,Moose Factory Site Moose Factory

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:10 Dec 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JAMES WAI-BONG LO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 2009