skip to content

Lo, Eddie Sun-Yee

CPSO#: 22898

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 28 Mar 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 28 Mar 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:McGill University, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Eddie Lo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 4 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Canadian Grads (No MCC) Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Mar 2015