skip to content

Lo, Aaron Ngar-Luen

CPSO#: 91414

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 11 Sep 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 11 Sep 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland Sch, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 217
3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 1M1
Phone: (905) 844-9054
Fax: (905) 844-5352 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Aaron N. Lo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 7 2021

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Oakville Trafalgar,Memorial Hospit Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Vascular Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AARON NGAR-LUEN LO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
AVP - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Oct 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Sep 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 2017