skip to content

Lloyd, Ronald Martin

CPSO#: 31298

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 24 Aug 1998

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Liverpool, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St. Regis Crescent South Toronto ON M3J 1Y6 Phone: 416-398-0638 Fax: 416-398-5932 Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732 Website: www.rsrs.com
Instructions: For records after 2004 please contact: Canadian Forces Base Petawawa Phone: (613)-687-5511
Date Received: 28 Apr 2014


Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St. Regis Crescent S. Toronto, Ontario M3J 1Y6 Tel: (416) 398-0638 Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732 Fax: (416) 398-5932 Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 17 Sep 2009

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 1980
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Aug 1998
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 24 Aug 1998
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014