skip to content

Livingston, Michael Hobbs

CPSO#: 96102

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 10 Jul 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster Children's Hospital
1200 Main St W
Room 4E
Hamilton ON  l8n 3z5 Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist
Pediatric Surgery Effective:11 Oct 2019 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MICHAEL HOBBS LIVINGSTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIVINGSTON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinician Investigator Program

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 7 - Pediatric Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Dec 2018
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Aug 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2021