skip to content

Liu, Wendy Wei

CPSO#: 100866

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Guelph Emergency Medical Services
Suite 103
73 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 6L9
Phone: (519) 837-1401
Fax: (519) 837-0133 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

Thunder Bay Regional
Health Sciences Centre
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Canada
Phone: (807) 684-6000
Fax: (807) 684-5828
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Drs. Yi & Liu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 11 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Liu ( CPSO# 100866)
Dr. J. Yi ( CPSO# 100645)

Business Address:
Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4

Business Address:
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4

Business Address:
50 Stone Road West
Guelph ON  N1G 2W1

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 25 Oct 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. WENDY WEI LIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

University of Toronto, 26 Aug 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2015