skip to content

Liu, Shiying

CPSO#: 95610

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 18 Sep 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
311-20 Wynford Dr
North York ON  M3C 1J4
Phone: (416) 447-9494
Fax: (416) 447-8558 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 311
20 Wynford Drive
Toronto ON  M3C 1J4
Canada
Phone: (416) 447-9494
Fax: (416) 447-8558
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

825 Coxwell Ave
East York ON  M4C 3E7
Canada
Phone: 416-469-6580 Ext. 2126
Fax: 416-469-6538
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: S. Liu and Y. Ge Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 24 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Liu ( CPSO# 95610 )
Dr. Y. Ge ( CPSO# 100231)

Business Address:
Markham Stouffville
PO Box 1800
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-7000

Business Address:
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 360-4000


Corporation Name: Shiying Liu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 01 2021

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Liu ( CPSO# 95610 )

Business Address:
311-20 Wynford Dr
North York ON  M3C 1J4

Business Address:
825 Coxwell Ave
East York ON  M4C 3E7

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:18 Oct 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SHIYING LIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Nov 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
CF - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2020 to 31 Jul 2020
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 2015