skip to content

Liu, Pamela Yu-Wah

CPSO#: 86834

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 Nov 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Nov 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lawrence Heights CHC
12 Flemington Road
Toronto ON  M6A 2N4
Phone: (416) 787-1661
Fax: (416) 787-3761 Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:21 Jul 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PAMELA YU-WAH LIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2008 to 31 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2009