skip to content

Liu, Lok-Wan Felix

CPSO#: 31223

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Jun 1978
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 Nov 1979

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 302
250 Harding Blvd. West
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9M7
Phone: (905) 883-5580
Fax: (905) 883-7824 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 205
330 Highway 7 East
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3P8
Canada
Phone: (905) 764-8808
Fax: (905) 764-9887
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: F.L. Liu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 23 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Liu ( CPSO# 31223 )

Business Address:
Suite 302
250 Harding Boulevard
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9M7
Phone Number: (905) 883-5580


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Hong Kong S A R

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:20 Jun 1985 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective:18 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LOK-WAN FELIX LIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIU is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 1979