skip to content

Liu, Helena Xiao

CPSO#: 95133

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 630
Box 70
790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone: (647) 427-6001
Fax: (416) 598-4659 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Helena Xiao Liu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Liu ( CPSO# 95133 )

Business Address:
630 - 790 Bay Street
Box 70
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone Number: (647) 427-6001

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HELENA XIAO LIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013