skip to content

Liu, Daisy Marianna

CPSO#: 97663

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
217 Terrace Hill Street
Unit 128
Brantford, Ontario
Brantford ON  N3R 1G8
Phone: (519) 304-8882
Fax: (519) 304-7880 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Canada
Phone: 519-751-5544
County: County of Brant
Electoral District: 04

39 Mount Pleasant Street
Brantford ON  N3T 1S7
Canada
Phone: (519) 753-3153
County: County of Brant
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Ahrens & Dr. Liu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 16 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Ahrens ( CPSO# 97662 )
Dr. D. Liu ( CPSO# 97663 )

Business Address:
Delhi Community Health Centre
105 Main Street
Delhi ON  N4B 2L8
Phone Number: (519) 582-2323

Business Address:
50 Dundurn Street South
Hamilton ON  L8P 4W3

Business Address:
90 Chedmac Drive
Hamilton ON  L9C 7W1

Business Address:
200 Terrance Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DAISY MARIANNA LIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016