skip to content

Liu, Chongen

CPSO#: 87033

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 27 Sep 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English, Mandarin

Education:West China Medical University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 205
2330 Kennedy Road
Scarborough ON  M1T 0A2
Phone: (416) 609-0000
Fax: (416) 609-0001 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Chongen Liu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 16 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Liu ( CPSO# 87033 )

Business Address:
Suite 205
2330 Kennedy Road
Scarborough ON  M1T 0A2
Phone Number: (416) 609-0000

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:19 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CHONGEN LIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
AVP - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Sep 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2009