skip to content

Liu, Cecil

CPSO#: 94501

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 22 Feb 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Feb 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CKHA
80 Grand Avenue West
Chatham ON  N7M 5L9
Phone: (519) 352-6400 Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Cecil Liu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 20 2019

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
Grey Bruce Health Services,Southampton Hospital Southampton
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Walkerton Site Walkerton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:11 Feb 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CECIL LIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 19 Oct 2010 to 11 Jan 2011
AVP - Family Medicine

Western University, 12 Jan 2011 to 18 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 19 Oct 2011 to 18 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Oct 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Feb 2013