skip to content

Littman, Jordan Michael

CPSO#: 100674

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Advanced Access Medical Clinics
Unit 7
3091 Strandherd Drive
Ottawa ON  K2G 4R9
Phone: (613) 825-5995 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Littman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 08 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Littman ( CPSO# 100674)

Business Address:
Advanced Access Medical Clinics
Unit 7
3091 Strandherd Drive
Ottawa ON  K2G 4R9
Phone Number: (613) 825-5995

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JORDAN MICHAEL LITTMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LITTMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2015