skip to content

Litt, Dhanjit

CPSO#: 95999

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglington Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-2200 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dhanjit Litt Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 27 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Litt ( CPSO# 95999 )

Business Address:
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-2200

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 26 Jul 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DHANJIT LITT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LITT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2013 to 31 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2014 to 31 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Sep 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Sep 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Jun 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2015