skip to content

Liston, James Peter

CPSO#: 30706

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: James Liston Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 10 2018

Medical Records Location

Address: J. Liston 134 5th Line Fraserville, ON K0L 1V0
Date Received: 19 Apr 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1979 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 May 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018