skip to content

Lister, John Godfrey

CPSO#: 15247

MEMBER STATUS
Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 09 Feb 1987
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Toronto, 1955

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:01 Jan 1960 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 1955
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 09 Feb 1987

Previous Hearings Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 22 Nov 1985
Summary:

 In November 1985, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Lister guilty of professional misconduct, as 
 defined in Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he failed to maintain the records that 
 are required to be kept respecting his patients, contrary to s. 27(3); in that he failed to 
 maintain the standard of practice of the profession, contrary to s. 27(21); and in that he 
 committed sexual impropriety with a patient, contrary to s. 27(29).  Consequently, the Committee 
 ordered that Dr. Lister's licence to practice be revoked.

Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 09 Feb 1987
Hearing Date(s): 21 Nov 1985