skip to content

Lisowski, David Francis Joseph

CPSO#: 26265

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 06 Dec 1973
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 06 Dec 1973

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Ottawa, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 205
274 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 1E6
Phone: (613) 962-5844
Fax: (613) 962-7406 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. David Lisowski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients seeking a copy of their medical record can send a written request to: Suite 205, 274 Dundas Street East, Belleville, ON., K8N 1E6 Attention Dr. Lisowski
Date Received: 07 Dec 2021

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1974 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DAVID FRANCIS JOSEPH LISOWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LISOWSKI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Dec 1973