skip to content

Lira Lea-Plaza, Gonzalo Rafael

CPSO#: 92147

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 22 Dec 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Chile, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 29 Sep 2009 to 18 Dec 2009
PEAP - CF - Cardiology

McMaster University, 19 Dec 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Aug 2012
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Dec 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2012