skip to content

Liquornik, Karen Nadine

CPSO#: 87946

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 12 Aug 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 12 Aug 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hebrew, Spanish

Education:McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
16700 bayview avenue
#215
newmarket
ontario L3X 1W1
Newmarket ON  L3X 1W1
Phone: (905)-953-7801
Fax: (905)-953-7803 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Southlake Regional Health Centre
Department of Pediatrics
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket, Ontario L3Y 2P9
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Canada
Phone: (905) 895-4521
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: B. Stotland Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 27 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Stotland ( CPSO# 75780 )
Dr. K. Liquornik ( CPSO# 87946 )

Business Address:
16700 Bayview Avenue
Suite 216
Newmarket ON  L3X 1W1
Phone Number: (905) 836-4173

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:24 May 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KAREN NADINE LIQUORNIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIQUORNIK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 28 Jan 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Paediatric Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2007
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Dec 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Nov 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2009