skip to content

Lipsman, Nir

CPSO#: 86216

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:Queen's University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Neurosurgery
2075 Bayview Avenue, Room A139
Toronto, Ontario, Canada
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: 416-480-6100 Ext. 6954
Fax: 416-480-6085 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Nir Lipsman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 06 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Lipsman ( CPSO# 86216 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Neurosurgery
Suite A139
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6954

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NIR LIPSMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIPSMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
CF - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016