skip to content

Lipinski, John Kenneth

CPSO#: 27826

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 02 Jan 1980
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 02 Jan 1980

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
216 Carlton Street
Toronto ON  M5A 2L1
Phone: (416) 926-0115
Fax: (416) 972-6709 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: J. Kenneth Lipinski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Alberta
British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:25 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JOHN KENNETH LIPINSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIPINSKI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Aug 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 1980