skip to content

Link, Kaitlin

CPSO#: 90598

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 Mar 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2200 Eglington Ave W
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: 905 813 2200 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Kaitlin Link Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 11 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Link ( CPSO# 90598 )

Business Address:
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-2200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Mar 2013 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 14 Oct 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KAITLIN LINK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LINK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Mar 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 31 Mar 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 06 Apr 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Mar 2014