skip to content

Lines, Matthew Alexander

CPSO#: 86482

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Aug 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 14 Jan 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: M.A. Lines Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 22 2019

Medical Records Location

Address: C H E O 401 Smyth Road Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Date Received: 01 May 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Genetics and Genomics Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Genetics and Genomics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Genetics and Genomics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Genetics and Genomics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Genetics and Genomics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Genetics and Genomics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Medical Genetics and Genomics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 28 Feb 2014
CF - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Aug 2019