skip to content

Lindzon, Ronald David

CPSO#: 32240

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 1983
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 06 Oct 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cachet Medical Centre
9255 Woodbine Avenue. Suite 2
Markham ON  L6C1Y9
Phone: (905) 887-2222
Fax: (905) 887-3655 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Ronald Lindzon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 18 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Lindzon ( CPSO# 32240 )

Business Address:
Cachet Medical Centre
Suite 2
9255 Woodbine Avenue
Markham ON  L6C 1Y9
Phone Number: (905) 887-2222

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective:29 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RONALD DAVID LINDZON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LINDZON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Mar 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Mar 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 2020