skip to content

Lindzon, Gillian Michelle

CPSO#: 95645

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Glengrove Medical Centre
2760 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4N 2J2
Phone: (416) 481-1173
Fax: (416) 481-7431 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

MAPLE
NA- House Calls
Toronto, ON
M4N2J2
Toronto ON  M4N 2J2
Canada
Phone: (647) 497-7453
Fax: 888-745-0435
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Gillian Lindzon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 29 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Lindzon ( CPSO# 95645 )

Business Address:
Glengrove Medical Centre
2760 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4N 2J2
Phone Number: (416) 481-1173

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GILLIAN MICHELLE LINDZON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LINDZON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Jan 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Feb 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2014